Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03060
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:May 21, 2020
Terminated:Oct 06, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tread Property Services, LLC
Represented By
Tread Property Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Paula S. Beran
Tavenner & Beran, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
9 9 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 10/06 2:02 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
8 8 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 09/17 5:31 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by David N. Tabakin. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 09/16 7:47 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/16 10:56 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint,5 Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY
Thursday, June 18, 2020
5 5 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/18 2:53 PM
Alias Summons and notice issued to Tread Property Services, LLC Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 17, 2020
4 4 misc Request for Alias Summons Wed 06/17 4:04 PM
Request for Alias Summons Related [+] filed by David N. Tabakin of Tavenner & Beran PLC on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Tabakin, David)
Related: [-] related document(s)2 Summons and Notice
Friday, May 22, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 05/22 12:31 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 20-03060 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 118633, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (Gary)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Fri 05/22 12:24 PM
Summons and notice issued to Tread Property Services, LLC Answer Due 6/22/2020 Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Thursday, May 21, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 05/21 1:53 PM
Adversary case 20-03060 Complaint against Tread Property Services, LLC filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Beran, Paula) Modified on 5/22/2020 to correct party filer (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-]