Delta Air Lines Inc. v. Bombardier Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-03025 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2020 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 21, 2020 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bombardier Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delta Air Lines Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 05/26/2020
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 05/26/2020
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 14, 2021 | ||
69 | 69
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 12/14 10:36 AM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to68 Notice of Appeal, filed by Delta Air Lines Inc. USCA Case Number 21-1028 UPON DUE CONSIDERATION WHEREOF, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment entered on March 26, 2021, is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 12/14/2021. (tp) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 12/14 10:37 AM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:69 USCA Mandate. (tp) |