Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03067
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 22, 2020
Terminated:Nov 04, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Express Network, Inc.
Represented By
Express Network, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 11/04 12:14 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 10/06 12:10 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
5 5 court Entry of Default Tue 09/01 9:44 AM
Entry of Default against Express Network, Inc. Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
4 4 motion Entry of Default Wed 08/26 12:30 PM
Notice and Motion for Entry of Default filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/01 4:49 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint,2 Summons and Notice
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Tue 05/26 1:42 PM
Summons and notice issued to Express Network, Inc. Answer Due 6/25/2020 Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Friday, May 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 05/22 6:26 PM
Adversary case 20-03067 Complaint against Express Network, Inc. (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]