Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03068
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 22, 2020
Terminated:Sep 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
EYP Realty LLC
Represented By
EYP Realty LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
5 5 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 09/02 10:46 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 11, 2020
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 08/11 11:22 AM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/10 2:16 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint,2 Summons and Notice
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Tue 05/26 1:44 PM
Summons and notice issued to EYP Realty LLC Answer Due 6/25/2020 Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Friday, May 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 05/22 6:31 PM
Adversary case 20-03068 Complaint against EYP Realty LLC (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]