Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03075
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 22, 2020
Terminated:Sep 02, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
LinkedIn Corporation
Represented By
LinkedIn Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
6 6 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 09/02 10:44 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 08/06 6:38 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/01 4:54 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint,3 Summons and Notice
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Tue 05/26 12:41 PM
Summons and notice issued to LinkedIn Corporation Answer Due 6/25/2020 Related [+][redocketed to attach Summons] (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Tue 05/26 12:40 PM
Summons and notice issued to LinkedIn Corporation Answer Due 6/25/2020 Related [+] (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Friday, May 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 05/22 7:08 PM
Adversary case 20-03075 Complaint against LinkedIn Corporation (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]