Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03081
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 22, 2020
Terminated:Dec 18, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Proofpoint, Inc.
Represented By
Proofpoint, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, December 18, 2020
5 5 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 12/18 5:05 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 11/30 1:32 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/01 4:58 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint,2 Summons and Notice
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Tue 05/26 1:06 PM
Summons and notice issued to Proofpoint, Inc. Answer Due 6/25/2020 Related [+] (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Friday, May 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 05/22 7:24 PM
Adversary case 20-03081 Complaint against Proofpoint, Inc. (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]