Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:20-ap-03084
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:May 22, 2020
Terminated:Feb 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
VPNE Parking Solutions LLC
Represented By
VPNE Parking Solutions LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
13 13 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 02/03 2:33 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
12 12 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Thu 12/31 12:14 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Transcript filed
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Thu 12/31 12:14 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Judgment
Monday, December 28, 2020
10 10 order Judgment Mon 12/28 11:31 AM
Judgment for Lynn L. Tavenner in the amount of $ 10,900.00 Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Friday, December 18, 2020
9 9 court Transcript filed Fri 12/18 5:42 PM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 12/17/2020, Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 03/18/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Thomas McKee.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/28/2020. Redaction Request Due By 01/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 01/19/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 03/18/2021. (Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-] 8 Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; Oral Motion to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading of Jennifer Pinkham for VPNE Parking Solutions LLC Denied Appearance(s): Brittany Nelson; Jennifer Pinkham (Re: related document(s)6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee)
Thursday, December 17, 2020
8 8 court Hearing held Thu 12/17 12:26 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; Oral Motion to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading of Jennifer Pinkham for VPNE Parking Solutions LLC Denied Appearance(s): Brittany Nelson; Jennifer Pinkham Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Friday, November 20, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 11/20 12:40 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
6 6 motion Default Judgment Fri 11/20 10:25 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Entry of Default
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
5 5 court Entry of Default Tue 09/01 9:54 AM
Entry of Default against VPNE Parking Solutions LLC Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Wednesday, August 26, 2020
4 4 motion Entry of Default Wed 08/26 12:34 PM
Notice and Motion for Entry of Default filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/01 5:00 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Foley & Lardner LLP on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint,2 Summons and Notice
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
2 2 summon Summons and Notice; Answer Tue 05/26 1:24 PM
Summons and notice issued to VPNE Parking Solutions LLC Answer Due 6/25/2020 Related [+] (Smith, Linda)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint
Friday, May 22, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 05/22 7:31 PM
Adversary case 20-03084 Complaint against VPNE Parking Solutions LLC (Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred) filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]