Advantage Vehicle Financing LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11259
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11259
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas M Horan |
Case #: | 1:20-bk-11265 |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Advantage Vehicle Financing LLC
2003 McCoy Rd
Orlando, FL 32809-7821 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago |
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order of Reassignment of Judge - Judge Thomas M Horan added to case. Involvement of Judge Craig T Goldblatt Terminated (SJS) |
|
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge John T. Dorsey Terminated (SH) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Advantage Vehicle Financing LLC. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities,. Filed by Advantage Vehicle Financing LLC. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
Friday, May 29, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Advantage Holdco, Inc., Case No. 20-11259 (JTD), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-11259 (JTD) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 5/29/2020. (RC) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/27 11:13 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-11265 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9791678, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Advantage Vehicle Financing LLC. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 05/26 10:25 PM
Judge John T. Dorsey added to case (BA) |