Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:20-bk-11259
Case Filed:May 26, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Dec 13, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Advantage Holdco, Inc.
2003 McCoy Rd
Orlando, FL 32809-7821
Represented By
Justin R. Alberto
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
1502 1502 claims Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/15 5:24 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Betina Wheelon . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 1501
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
1501 1501 notice Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Wed 05/14 3:05 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Hearing Originally Scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 03:00 PM has been rescheduled. Filed by CBIZ Accounting, Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
1500 1500 claims Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 4:46 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Hallie Dreiman . Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 1497 ,1498