Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. Addison Professional Financial Search LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01094 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Addison Professional Financial Search LLC
125 S. Wacker Drive Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60606 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 08/04 11:00 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1094 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Tue 12/01 11:21 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, November 30, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only
Mon 11/30 11:34 AM
Order Signed On 11/30/2020 Re: On Third Motion For An Order Approving Settlements Of Avoidance Actions Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 07/24 1:23 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
9 | 9
13
pgs
order
Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only
Fri 07/24 8:06 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/16 5:44 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/09 1:59 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 07/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Tue 06/23 9:43 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/10 1:46 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 06/05 10:53 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 06/03 11:06 AM
Adversary case 20-01094 Complaint against Addison Professional Financial Search LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 06/03 3:41 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01094 smb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14034674. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |