Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. CREFII-SCC, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01113 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
CREFII-SCC, LLC
50 Washington Street
Norwalk, CT 06854 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 08/04 2:07 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1113 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Tuesday, August 18, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
![]() So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 8/18/2020. Re: Voluntary Dismissal Of Adversary Proceeding (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code(Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Tuesday, July 07, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Amended Answer to Complaint Answer filed by James H. Shenwick on behalf of CREFII-SCC, LLC.(Shenwick, James) |
|
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-01113 Complaint against CREFII-SCC, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 06/03 3:42 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01113 smb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14034674. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |