Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-13774

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Magdeline D Coleman
Case #: 4:20-ap-00190
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Oct 19, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Energy Conservation Group, LLC d/b/a Skaggs-Walsh
Represented By
The Energy Conservation Group, LLC d/b/a Skaggs-Walsh
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT
Represented By
ROBERT W. SEITZER
Karalis PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Monday, October 19, 2020
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 10/19 8:16 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:20-ap-190 Settled. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/19 8:17 AM
Adversary Case 4:20-ap-190 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2020
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 07/30 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Monday, July 27, 2020
8 8 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Mon 07/27 8:19 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant. Related [+] (W., Christine)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
7 7 court Hearing Held Wed 07/22 11:36 AM
Hearing Held on4 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant Filed by CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT Represented by ROBERT W. SEITZER (Counsel). Related [+]. ORDER to be entered (G., Eileen)
Related: [-] ,4
Friday, July 10, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of No Response Fri 07/10 5:01 PM
Certificate of No Response to Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant Filed by ROBERT W. SEITZER on behalf of CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT Related [+]. (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 25, 2020
5 5 notice Notice of Motion Thu 06/25 12:33 PM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT. Hearing scheduled 7/22/2020 at 10:30 AM at nix2 - Courtroom #2. (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
4 4 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Thu 06/25 12:32 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 between the Trustee and the Defendant Filed by CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT Represented by ROBERT W. SEITZER (Counsel). (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 05, 2020
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/05 2:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on The Energy Conservation Group, LLC d/b/a Skaggs-Walsh 6/5/2020 . (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 06/04 9:51 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) The Energy Conservation Group, LLC d/b/a Skaggs-Walsh Date Issued 6/4/2020, Answer Due 7/4/2020. (W., Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/03 11:06 AM
Adversary case 20-00190 Complaint by ROBERT W. SEITZER on behalf of CHRISTINE C. SHUBERT against The Energy Conservation Group, LLC d/b/a Skaggs-Walsh. Fee Amount $0.00 . (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (SEITZER, ROBERT)
Related: [-]