Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-01138
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Apr 08, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Level 3 Financing, Inc.
1025 Eldorado Boulevard
Broomfield, CO 80021
Represented By
Level 3 Financing, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, April 08, 2021
15 15 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 04/08 4:17 PM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 4/8/2021 Voluntarily Dismissing this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 12
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 04/08 4:18 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1138 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
14 14 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
13 13 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
12 12 misc Stipulation Tue 12/01 11:12 AM
Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
11 11 3 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Mon 11/30 11:34 AM
Order Signed On 11/30/2020 Re: On Third Motion For An Order Approving Settlements Of Avoidance Actions Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
10 10 answer None Thu 09/03 1:07 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Kieran M. Corcoran on behalf of Level 3 Financing, Inc.. (Corcoran, Kieran)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, July 24, 2020
9 9 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/24 2:22 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 13 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Fri 07/24 8:17 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 07/16 6:29 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
5 5 notice Affidavit of Service Thu 07/09 2:22 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/10 2:19 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Friday, June 05, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 06/05 10:31 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/03 1:35 PM
Adversary case 20-01138 Complaint against Level 3 Financing, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A