Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-01142
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Feb 28, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Native Ads, Inc.
244 5th Avenue Ste N-249
New York, NY 10001
Represented By
Native Ads, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, February 28, 2022
35 35 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 02/28 3:25 PM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 2/28/2022 Voluntarily Dismissing this Adversary Proceeding. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 34
34 34 misc Stipulation Mon 02/28 10:04 AM
Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 02/28 3:27 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1142 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
33 33 misc Mediator's Final Report Settled Thu 12/16 9:09 AM
Mediator's Final Report Settled Filed by Eric J. Haber on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Haber, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
32 32 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 07/12 8:26 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement . Filed by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of Native Ads, Inc.. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
31 31 order So Ordered Stipulation Tue 06/01 2:15 PM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed on 6/1/2021 to Move the Adversary Proceeding to the Third Procedures Order Governing Adversary Proceedings. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 30
Thursday, May 20, 2021
30 30 misc Stipulation Thu 05/20 9:43 AM
Stipulation to Move the Adversary Proceeding to the Third Procedures Order Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of Native Ads, Inc.. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
29 29 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/06 3:26 PM
Certificate of Service of Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of Native Ads, Inc.. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
28 28 answer None Thu 05/06 11:52 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of Native Ads, Inc.. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, April 19, 2021
27 27 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 04/19 3:42 PM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 4/19/2021 Vacating Default Judgment. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 24 ,26
26 26 misc Stipulation Mon 04/19 12:03 PM
Stipulation to Vacate Default Judgment Filed by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of Native Ads, Inc.. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
25 25 other Certificate, Service Wed 04/14 10:56 AM
Certificate of Service of Motion to Vacate Entry of Default Judgment filed by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of Native Ads, Inc.. (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
24 24 motion Motion, Vacate Mon 04/12 12:42 PM
Motion to Vacate Entry of Default Judgment filed by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of Native Ads, Inc. with hearing to be held on 4/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (DSJ). (Jones, Roland)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law
Att: 3 Affirmation of Timothy Dillon
Att: 4 Affidavit of Jon Malach
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Sunday, March 14, 2021
23 23 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Mon 03/15 1:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 03/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #22 )
Thursday, March 11, 2021
22 22 misc PDF Notice Thu 03/11 6:01 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 21
21 21 order Judgment Thu 03/11 6:00 PM
Judgment signed on 3/11/2021. Judgment entered the Plaintiff, Alan Nisselson, be awarded a default judgment against the Defendant, Native Ads, Inc, in a total judgment of $145,328.26. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 21,0010 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 20
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
20 20 order Motion, Default Judgment Wed 03/10 5:53 PM
Order signed on 3/10/2021 Granting Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] . (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
19 19 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #18 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
18 18 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
17 17 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/17 2:00 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
15 15 motion Motion, Default Judgment Thu 02/11 11:35 AM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgement
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgement
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
14 14 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 02/11 12:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 02/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Monday, February 08, 2021
13 13 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 02/08 2:34 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Native Ads, Inc. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, February 04, 2021
12 12 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 02/04 12:29 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
11 11 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/03 12:15 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
9 9 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/24 2:24 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 13 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Fri 07/24 8:17 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 07/16 6:32 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
5 5 notice Affidavit of Service Thu 07/09 2:24 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/10 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Friday, June 05, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 06/05 9:45 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/03 1:43 PM
Adversary case 20-01142 Complaint against Native Ads, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A