Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-01143
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Sep 10, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Neustar Information Services, Inc.
21575 Ridgetop Circle
Sterling, VA 20166
Represented By
Neustar Information Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, September 10, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/10 11:11 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1143 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 14, 2021
23 23 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Mon 03/15 1:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 03/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #22 )
Friday, March 12, 2021
22 22 misc PDF Notice Fri 03/12 2:12 PM
Notice of Default Judgment Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 21
21 21 1 pgs order Judgment Fri 03/12 2:11 PM
Judgment signed on 3/12/2021. Judgement entered that the Plaintiff, Alan Nisselson, be awarded a default judgment against the Defendant, Neustar Information Services, Inc., in a total judgment of $116,368.30. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 21,0014 Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 20
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
20 20 order Motion, Default Judgment Wed 03/10 5:56 PM
Order signed on 3/10/2021 Granting Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] . (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
19 19 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #18 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
18 18 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
17 17 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/17 2:00 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
15 15 motion Motion, Default Judgment Thu 02/11 11:37 AM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgement
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgement
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
14 14 misc Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 02/11 12:13 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . Notice Date 02/10/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Monday, February 08, 2021
13 13 misc Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 02/08 2:50 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Neustar Information Services, Inc. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, February 04, 2021
12 12 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 02/04 12:31 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
11 11 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/03 12:16 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
9 9 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/24 2:25 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 13 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Fri 07/24 8:17 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 07/16 6:33 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
5 5 notice Affidavit of Service Thu 07/09 2:25 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/10 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Friday, June 05, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 06/05 9:45 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/03 1:45 PM
Adversary case 20-01143 Complaint against Neustar Information Services, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A