Sizmek Technologies, Inc. v. PwC Isreal - Kesselman & Kessselman C.P.A.s
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01150 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
PwC Isreal - Kesselman & Kessselman C.P.A.s
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 13, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/13 9:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1150 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, May 12, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for March 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-01150 Complaint against PwC Isreal - Kesselman & Kessselman C.P.A.s (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |