Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-01152
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Apr 14, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
RhythmOne (US) Holding, Inc.
935 Main Street
Redwood City, CA 94063
Represented By
RhythmOne (US) Holding, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/14 3:39 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1152 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
32 32 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 04/12 12:12 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 08, 2021
31 31 order ~Generic~ Order Thu 04/08 3:01 PM
Order Signed on 4/8/2021 Regarding Fifth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
30 30 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 03/12 11:40 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 29
29 29 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 03/12 11:08 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for March 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
28 28 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #27 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
27 27 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
26 26 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/17 2:05 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 25
25 25 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
24 24 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/03 12:20 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 23
23 23 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
22 22 misc Stipulation Fri 01/15 2:22 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 07, 2021
21 21 misc Stipulation Thu 01/07 3:55 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
20 20 misc Stipulation Fri 12/18 10:54 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
19 19 misc Stipulation Wed 11/18 8:10 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
18 18 notice Notice, Hearing Fri 11/13 6:11 PM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Mediation on January 14, 2021 filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 23, 2020
17 17 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 10/23 10:03 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/28/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB)(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 10/21 8:41 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 11:14 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1 ,13
Tuesday, September 22, 2020
14 14 misc Stipulation Tue 09/22 6:02 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 09/22 2:41 PM
Third Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 10/22/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Tue 09/22 1:26 PM
Request for a Third Summons filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
12 12 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/24 2:31 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 13 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Fri 07/24 8:19 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
10 10 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 07/16 6:39 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
8 8 notice Affidavit of Service Thu 07/09 2:31 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
6 6 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 07/08 1:42 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/24 12:03 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1 ,4
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
4 4 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 06/23 8:26 AM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/23/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 22, 2020
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Mon 06/22 4:21 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/10 2:29 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Friday, June 05, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 06/05 10:02 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/03 2:13 PM
Adversary case 20-01152 Complaint against RhythmOne (US) Holding, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A