Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. Stroeer SSP GmbH
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01163 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Stroeer SSP GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 05, 2022 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/05 12:12 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1163 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
||
Thursday, April 28, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of Mailing PDF notice
Fri 04/29 12:09 AM
Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 04/28/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 26, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
misc
PDF Notice
Tue 04/26 3:38 PM
Notice of Default Judgment (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Tue 04/26 3:37 PM
Judgment signed on 4/26/2022. Judgment entered that the Plaintiff Alan Nisselson, the chapter 7 trustee for the bankruptcy be awarded a default judgment against theDefendant, Stroeer SSP GmbH, in a total judgment of $25,482.02. JUDGMENT INDEX NUMBER BC 22,0010 (Rouzeau, Anatin) |
|
25 | 25
order
Motion, Default Judgment
Tue 04/26 12:29 PM
Order for Default Judgment Signed on 4/26/2022. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Mon 04/11 10:53 AM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Order for Default Judgment | ||
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 03/11 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 03/10/2022. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Motion, Default Judgment
Wed 03/09 4:34 PM
Motion for Default Judgment filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 4/7/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (DSJ) Responses due by 4/6/2022, (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment of Order for Default Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Application for Default Judgment | ||
Att: 3 Certification of Service | ||
Tuesday, March 08, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 03/08 2:53 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Stroeer SSP GmbH. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 03/08 12:38 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certification of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 29, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Affidavit of Service
Tue 06/29 2:22 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/12 11:50 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 03/12 11:08 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for March 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Mon 03/08 2:19 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Stroeer SSP GmbH . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Mon 03/08 8:47 AM
Request for a Amended Summons filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
||
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
order
Motion, Appoint
Fri 03/05 11:25 AM
Order Signed on 3/5/2021 Granting the Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Appoint a Special Process Server to Serve an Entity in a Foreign Country. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 03/05 9:31 AM
Letter Regarding Ex-Parte Motion Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Motion, Appoint
Thu 03/04 9:19 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Appoint a Special Process Server filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/17 2:13 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 02/17 2:12 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Stroeer SSP GmbH . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/03 12:23 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 07/24 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
4 | 4
13
pgs
order
Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only
Fri 07/24 8:21 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/16 6:46 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 06/03 2:39 PM
Adversary case 20-01163 Complaint against Stroeer SSP GmbH (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |