Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-01164
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Apr 14, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Switch, Ltd.
7135 S. Decatur Boulevard
Las Vegas, NV 89118
Represented By
Switch, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/14 3:36 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1164 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
22 22 notice Notice, Dismissal Mon 04/12 12:08 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 08, 2021
21 21 order ~Generic~ Order Thu 04/08 2:57 PM
Order Signed on 4/8/2021 Regarding Fifth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
20 20 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 03/12 11:51 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 19
19 19 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 03/12 11:08 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for March 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
18 18 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #17 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
17 17 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
16 16 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/17 2:14 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/03 12:23 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 18, 2021
12 12 misc Stipulation Mon 01/18 5:23 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
11 11 misc Stipulation Mon 11/16 10:11 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
10 10 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/24 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 13 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Fri 07/24 8:21 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
8 8 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 07/16 6:47 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
6 6 notice Affidavit of Service Thu 07/09 2:37 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 07/01 4:04 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/10 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Friday, June 05, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 06/05 8:26 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/03 2:46 PM
Adversary case 20-01164 Complaint against Switch, Ltd. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A