Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-01171
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Feb 26, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Texas EZPAWN, L.P.
2500 Bee Cave Road Building 1, Suite 200
Rollingwood, TX 78746
Represented By
Texas EZPAWN, L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, February 26, 2021
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/26 11:50 AM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1171 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
18 18 order So Ordered Stipulation Thu 02/25 8:06 AM
So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 2/25/2021. Re: Voluntary Dismissal Of Adversary Proceeding (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
17 17 misc Stipulation Wed 02/24 2:37 PM
Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
16 16 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/17 2:18 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 02/03 12:25 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
12 12 notice Notice, Hearing Fri 11/13 6:15 PM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Mediation on January 7, 2021 filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 04, 2020
11 11 motion Motion, Attachment Fri 09/04 5:06 PM
Motion for Attachment for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Duane J. Brescia filed by Steven Richman on behalf of Texas EZPAWN, L.P.. (Richman, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pleading Proposed Order
Att: 2 Pleading Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 03, 2020
10 10 answer None Thu 09/03 6:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Steven Richman on behalf of Texas EZPAWN, L.P.. (Richman, Steven)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, July 24, 2020
9 9 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/24 2:40 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 13 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Fri 07/24 8:22 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 07/16 6:55 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
5 5 notice Affidavit of Service Thu 07/09 2:41 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/10 2:41 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Friday, June 05, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 06/05 8:30 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/03 2:59 PM
Adversary case 20-01171 Complaint against Texas EZPAWN, L.P. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A