Sizmek DSP, Inc. v. The Rubicon Project, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01174 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
The Rubicon Project, Inc.
12181 W. Bluff Creek Drive 4th Floor
Playa Vista, CA 90094 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Thu 11/04 9:23 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Service Lists filed by Jacob S. Frumkin on behalf of The Rubicon Project, Inc.. (Frumkin, Jacob) |
|
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Thu 04/15 11:33 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/15 3:17 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1174 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
order
~Generic~ Order
Thu 04/08 2:49 PM
Order Signed on 4/8/2021 Regarding Fifth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 03/12 11:55 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 03/12 11:08 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for March 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/17 2:20 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/17 1:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 02/03 12:27 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Wed 02/03 11:21 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing initially scheduled for January 29, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice, Hearing
Fri 11/13 6:17 PM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Mediation on January 26, 2021 filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, October 20, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding
Tue 10/20 4:24 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding of Cole Schotz P.C. and Notice of Withdrawal of Latham & Watkins as Attorneys for the Defendant, filed by Jacob S. Frumkin on behalf of The Rubicon Project, Inc.. (Frumkin, Jacob) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Fri 08/28 12:36 PM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 07/24 2:42 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
9 | 9
13
pgs
order
Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only
Fri 07/24 8:24 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel) |
|
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/16 6:57 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/09 2:43 PM
Affidavit of Service filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 07/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Thu 06/25 11:52 AM
Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Complaint Filed by Joseph L. Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/10 2:44 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 06/05 8:30 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Wednesday, June 03, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Wed 06/03 3:04 PM
Adversary case 20-01174 Complaint against The Rubicon Project, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |