Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10971

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stuart M Bernstein
Case #: 1:20-ap-01181
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2020
Terminated:Aug 04, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
GTT Communications, Inc.
7900 Tysons One Place Suite 1450
Maclean, VA 22102
Represented By
GTT Communications, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sizmek Technologies, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South, 5th
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sizmek DSP, Inc.
401 Park Avenue South 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Brigette McGrath
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, August 04, 2023
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/04 3:06 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-1181 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
15 15 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #14 )
Monday, March 01, 2021
14 14 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 03/01 4:20 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
13 13 notice Notice, Dismissal Tue 12/01 11:42 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc., Sizmek Technologies, Inc..(McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 30, 2020
12 12 3 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Mon 11/30 11:34 AM
Order Signed On 11/30/2020 Re: On Third Motion For An Order Approving Settlements Of Avoidance Actions Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
11 11 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 07/24 1:57 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc., Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 13 pgs order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Fri 07/24 8:17 AM
Order Signed On 7/23/2020 Re: Second Motion For An Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By The Debtors Pursuant To Sections 502, 547, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
9 9 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 07/16 7:02 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc., Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 21, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
7 7 notice Affidavit of Service Thu 07/09 2:17 PM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc., Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Thu 07/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for July 14, 2020 (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/10 2:14 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek DSP, Inc., Sizmek Technologies, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Monday, June 08, 2020
4 4 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/08 12:58 PM
Order Signed On 6/8/2020 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Darlene M. Nowak Related [+] . (Barrett, Chantel)
Related: [-] 3
3 3 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Mon 06/08 12:05 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Darlene M. Nowak on behalf of GTT Communications, Inc.. (Nowak, Darlene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 06/08 12:06 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 20-01181 smb] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14044825. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #3
Friday, June 05, 2020
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 06/05 8:30 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 7/6/2020, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/03 3:25 PM
Adversary case 20-01181 Complaint against GTT Communications, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Brigette McGrath on behalf of Sizmek Technologies, Inc., Sizmek DSP, Inc.. (McGrath, Brigette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B