California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:20-cv-04980
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2020
Terminated:Sep 02, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 01, 2020 12:47 AM PST
Defendant
STSO Veronica Castellon
Represented By
Jennifer R Jacobs
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
STSO Harris
Represented By
Jennifer R Jacobs
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
TSM Martinez
Represented By
Jennifer R Jacobs
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
David Pekoske
Represented By
Jennifer R Jacobs
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Jennifer R Jacobs
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Richard Copeland
Represented By
Richard T Copeland
Conflict Solution Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Lundquist
Represented By
Jonathan W Corbett
Jonathan Corbett
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
82 82 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 12/01 3:25 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order,80 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order81 , CCA # 22-55709 The judgment of this Court, entered September 08, 2023, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (car)
Related: [-]