Original Case: 2:20-cv-04980

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-55908
Typecivil / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 24, 2021
Terminated:May 24, 2022
Last checked: Thursday May 26, 2022 1:26 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Jennifer Raines Jacobs
USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney
contact info
Sharon Swingle
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID PEKOSKE, in his official capacity as Administrator of the U.S. Transportation Security Administration
Represented By
Jennifer Raines Jacobs
USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney
contact info
Sharon Swingle
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
VERONICA CASTELLON, STSO
Represented By
Jennifer Raines Jacobs
USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney
contact info
Sharon Swingle
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HARRIS, STSO
Represented By
Jennifer Raines Jacobs
USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney
contact info
Sharon Swingle
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARTINEZ, TSM
Represented By
Jennifer Raines Jacobs
USLA - Office of the U.S. Attorney
contact info
Sharon Swingle
DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JESSICA LUNDQUIST
Represented By
Jonathan Corbett
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2022 1:20 AM PDT
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Jessica Lundquist Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/31/2021. Appellant Jessica Lundquist opening brief due 10/25/2021. Appellees Veronica Castellon, Harris, Martinez, David Pekoske and United States of America answering brief due 11/26/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12210428] (RT) [Entered: 08/24/2021 03:41 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 2 pgs Mediation Questionnaire
Att: 5 22 pgs Case Opening Packet