PARK v. KIM
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | Lois Bloom |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-02636 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 10, 2020 3:28 AM EST |
Defendant
David Dennis Kim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Minhye Park
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
53 | 53
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Wed 05/01 5:02 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, defendant's motion for an award of reasonable attorney's fees pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(b)(2)(C), ECF No.46 , is granted. Defendant is awarded $8,053.50 in attorney's fees which shall be paid by plaintiff's counsel, Jae Lee, within 14 days of this Order. See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/1/2024. (IK) |