Park v. Kim
Original Case: 1:20-cv-02636
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-02057 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Sep 19, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 31, 2024 4:16 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
David Dennis Kim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Minhye Park
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/31/2024 3:55 AM EST |
Monday, September 19, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Minhye Park, FILED. [3386317] 22-2057 [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:09 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 9 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 08/24/2022, RECEIVED.[3386324] 22-2057 [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:12 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/25/2022, RECEIVED.[3386325] 22-2057 [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:12 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Minhye Park, district court receipt # ANYEDC-15949615, FILED.[3386329] 22-2057 [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:13 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3386330] 22-2057 [Entered: 09/21/2022 04:14 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |