Labadie v. NU Era Towing and Service, Inc.
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J Vilardo |
Referred: | Leslie G Foschio |
Case #: | 1:20-cv-00722 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 12, 2020 6:26 AM EST |
Defendant
NU Era Towing and Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Faith Labadie
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 01/08 11:58 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to25 Notice of Appeal, filed by Faith Labadie; ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. (SG) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
Clerks Certificate
Fri 10/07 10:35 AM
CLERKS CERTIFICATE filed and electronically sent to Court of Appeals re26 Designation of Record on Appeal/Index. (SG) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
Designation of Record on Appeal
Thu 10/06 6:38 PM
DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Faith Labadie re25 Notice of Appeal, CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Bromberg, Brian) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
utility
Remark
Fri 09/23 11:01 AM
Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1 of the US Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Forms C and D must be completed within 14 days after the filing of a notice of appeal. Forms C and D can be obtained at www.ca2.uscourts.gov. (SG) |
||
utility
Remark
Fri 09/23 11:02 AM
Within 14 days of filing the Notice of Appeal, the appellant is required to electronically file with the District Court an index of filed documents it wishes the Court of Appeals to consider, called Designation of Record on Appeal. After receipt, the Clerks Office will certify and transmit the index to the Circuit. (SG) |
||
Thursday, September 22, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 09/22 8:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to22 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Report and Recommendations,23 Judgment by Faith Labadie. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYWDC-4681210.(Bromberg, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Report and Recommendation, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B -- Decision and Order adopting Report and Recommendation, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C -- Judgment Dismissing Case, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/22 8:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L. Bromberg on behalf of Faith Labadie (Bromberg, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Wed 08/24 12:40 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. against Faith Labadie. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 8/24/22. (SG) |
|
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/23 5:17 PM
DECISION & ORDER granting10 Motion to Dismiss; adopting16 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for the defendant and close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/23/2022. (RFI) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply/Response
Wed 08/03 3:50 PM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re19 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by NU Era Towing and Service, Inc.. (Gerber, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 07/13 9:34 AM
TEXT ORDER re19 Objection filed by Faith Labadie. Response due by 8/3/2022. Reply due by 8/17/2022. If necessary, the Court will schedule oral argument at a later time. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/13/2022. (EK) |
||
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 07/12 11:58 PM
OBJECTION to16 Report and Recommendations by Faith Labadie. (Andrews, Seth) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 06/24 8:47 AM
TEXT ORDER granting17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Faith Labadie. Objections to R&R due by 7/12/2022. Responses due by 8/2/2022. Replies due by 8/16/2022. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/24/2022. (RFI) |
||
Thursday, June 23, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/23 3:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Faith Labadie.(Andrews, Seth) |
|
Tuesday, June 14, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 06/14 4:48 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss filed by NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. should be GRANTED; the Complaint should be DISMISSED with prejudice and without leave to replead. The Clerk of Court should be directed to close the file. Objections due fourteen days from receipt. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 06/14/2022. (TAH) |
|
Thursday, September 30, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney
Thu 09/30 8:07 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney: Aaron J. Aisen no longer appearing for Defendant NU Era Towing and Service, Inc.. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. (Aisen, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply/Response
Fri 10/02 12:00 AM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NU Era Towing and Service, Inc..(Aisen, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/16 11:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Faith Labadie. (Andrews, Seth) |
|
Monday, August 17, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 08/17 12:38 PM
TEXT ORDER re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. Responses due by 9/16/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. Oral argument at the discretion of the court. Issued by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 8/17/2020. (SDW) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/13 10:37 AM
TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/13/2020. (CMD) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Wed 08/12 4:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by NU Era Towing and Service, Inc..(Aisen, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/22 1:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NU Era Towing and Service, Inc.. (Aisen, Aaron) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/22 1:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Jacob Aisen on behalf of NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. (Aisen, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 07/15 11:32 AM
ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD) |
||
Tuesday, July 14, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
order
Text Order ~Util - Update Answer Due Date
Tue 07/14 11:48 AM
TEXT ORDER re5 Stipulation filed by NU Era Towing and Service, Inc., IS HEREBY SO ORDERED. Answer due on or before 8/12/2020. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/14/2020. (RFI) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/13 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Gerber on behalf of NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. (Gerber, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/13 4:19 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by NU Era Towing and Service, Inc.. (Gerber, Daniel) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Mon 07/13 4:18 PM
Letter filed by NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. as to NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. Letter to Hon. Vilardo Accompanying Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer . (Gerber, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/25 4:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Labadie. NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Andrews, Seth) |
|
Tuesday, June 16, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/16 11:18 AM
Summons Issued as to NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. (JD) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/16 11:12 AM
Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Tue 06/16 11:14 AM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at[LINK:http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution] . (JD) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/16 11:15 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JD) |
||
Monday, June 15, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/15 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against NU Era Towing and Service, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3867578, filed by Faith Labadie.(Andrews, Seth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |