SGCE LLC Jointly Administered under 20-33109.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-33109
Lead case is: 4:20-bk-33109
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:20-bk-33110 |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2020 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 02, 2020 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 23, 2020 |
Converted: | Jul 16, 2020 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
SGCE LLC
120 N Munger St
Pasadena, TX 77506-1326 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Ronald J Sommers
Nathan Sommers Jacobs 2800 Post Oak Blvd 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 2:48 PM CDT |
Friday, June 19, 2020 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 06/19 8:16 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-33110 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22210332. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by SGCE LLC. (Kilmer, Brian) |