Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:20-bk-33109
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Sep 02, 2020
Claims Deadline:Nov 23, 2020
Converted:Jul 16, 2020
Terminated:May 14, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Juniper Specialty Products LLC
120 N Munger St
Pasadena, TX 77506-1326
Represented By
Elizabeth M Guffy
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Stephen Frank Myers Risley
Kilmer Crosby Et Al
contact info
Brian A Kilmer
Kilmer Crosby & Quadros PLLC
contact info
Steven W Soule
Hall Estill Et Al
contact info
Debtor
SGCE LLC
120 N Munger St
Pasadena, TX 77506-1326
Represented By
Elizabeth M Guffy
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Brian A Kilmer
Kilmer Crosby & Quadros PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Ronald J Sommers
Nathan Sommers Jacobs 2800 Post Oak Blvd 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Simon Richard Mayer
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Elizabeth M Guffy
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Anderson L Cao
Akerman LLP
contact info
Ronald J Sommers
Nathan Sommers Jacobs
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Hector Duran, Jr
U.S. Trustee
contact info
Stephen Douglas Statham
Office Of Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/10/2024 8:34 AM CDT
Friday, June 19, 2020
crditcrd none Fri 06/19 5:56 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-33109 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22210218. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Fri 06/19 5:54 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Juniper Specialty Products LLC. (Kilmer, Brian)
Related: [-]