Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11648

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:20-bk-11634
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2020
Terminated:Jun 28, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sober Media Group, LLC
200 Powell Pl
Brentwood, TN 37027-7514
Represented By
Dennis Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Monday, June 28, 2021
7 7 order Final Decree Mon 06/28 12:19 PM
Final Decree Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Case and Order (A) Directing that the Administration of All Remaining Matters in Respect of Affiliate Cases Take Place in the Open Case; (B) Amending the Order Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases, and (C) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 6/28/2021 (NAB)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 06/28 5:24 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (MD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
6 6 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:14 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge John T. Dorsey Terminated (SH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 08/05 2:47 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Sober Media Group, LLC. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 08/05 12:55 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Sober Media Group, LLC. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 06/23 3:36 PM
Order Authorizing and Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only. An order (the "Joint Administration Order") has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases listed below under Case No. 20-11648 The docket in Case No. 20-11648 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: Case No. 20-11606 Case No. 20-11607 Case No. 20-11608 Case No. 20-11609 Case No. 20-11610 Case No. 20-11611 Case No. 20-11612 Case No. 20-11613 Case No. 20-11614 Case No. 20-11615 Case No. 20-11616 Case No. 20-11617 Case No. 20-11618 Case No. 20-11619 Case No. 20-11620 Case No. 20-11621 Case No. 20-11622 Case No. 20-11623 Case No. 20-11624 Case No. 20-11625 Case No. 20-11626 Case No. 20-11627 Case No. 20-11628 Case No. 20-11629 Case No. 20-11630 Case No. 20-11631 Case No. 20-11632 Case No. 20-11633 Case No. 20-11634 Case No. 20-11635 Case No. 20-11636 Case No. 20-11637 Case No. 20-11638 Case No. 20-11639 Case No. 20-11640 Case No. 20-11641 Case No. 20-11642 Case No. 20-11643 Case No. 20-11644 Case No. 20-11645 Case No. 20-11646 Case No. 20-11647 Case No. 20-11648 Case No. 20-11649 Case No. 20-11650 Case No. 20-11651 Case No. 20-11652 and Case No. 20-11653 and Case No. 20-11654 Signed on 6/23/2020. (RC)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 21, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Sun 06/21 4:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-11634 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9836501, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 20, 2020
1 1 28 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sat 06/20 8:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Sober Media Group, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 07/20/2020 (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Sat 06/20 9:53 PM
Judge John T. Dorsey added to case (BA)
Related: [-]