Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:20-bk-11648
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2020
Terminated:Jun 28, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Oct 20, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
AAC Holdings, Inc.
200 Powell Place
Brentwood, TN 37027
Represented By
Eva M Spahn
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
David Bruce Kurzweil
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Nancy Ann Peterman
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Matthew Allen Petrie
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Kevin D. Finger
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Alison Elko Franklin
C/o Mckenna Long & Aldridge LLP
contact info
Eric J. Howe
contact info
Dennis Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2023 11:16 AM EDT
Claims Agent
Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.
www.donlinrecano.com 6201 15th Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11219
Creditor
Janie T. LaCombe, personal representative to the Estate of Carl LaCombe
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Waxman
Morris James LLP
contact info
Creditor
EBP Supply Solutions
Represented By
Wanda Borges
Borges & Associates, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Estate of Bongar
Represented By
Deirdre M. Richards
Fineman Krekstein & Harris P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Estate of Carl LaCombe
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Waxman
Morris James LLP
contact info
Creditor
Estate of Joseph Haugen
6774 Market St.
Upper Darby, PA 19082
Represented By
Glenn A. Brown
Real World Law, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Sam Gasperoni
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP 824 N. Market Street, Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Kristi JoLynn Doughty
C/o Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
contact info
Creditor
O.A. Peterson Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan P. Vuotto
Mcandrew Vuotto LLC
contact info
Gary D. Bressler
Mcelroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter LLP
contact info
Scott Levin
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info
Creditor
Teri Hill
Represented By
Daniel K. Hogan
Hoganmcdaniel
contact info
William Berman
Berman & Riedel, LLP
contact info
Fritz Gray
Maney, Gordon, Zeller, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Hillsborough County Tax Collector
P.O. BOX 1110
TAMPA, FL 33601
Represented By
Brian T. FitzGerald
Hillsborough County Annorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Jenene House
Represented By
Daniel K. Hogan
Hoganmcdaniel
contact info
William Berman
Berman & Riedel, LLP
contact info
Fritz Gray
Maney, Gordon, Zeller, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Jonathan Nero
Represented By
Justin David Grosz
The Jg Firm LLC
contact info
Creditor
Victor Milanes
Represented By
Shelley A. Kinsella
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Creditor
Lisa Johnson
Represented By
Daniel K. Hogan
Hoganmcdaniel
contact info
Sander L. Esserman
Stutzman & Bromberg
contact info
David A. Klingler
Stutzman, Bromberg, Esserman & Plifka
contact info
Jeremiah Lowe
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Adam Ellis
Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Chu
Ladah Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
Scott Johnson
Represented By
Daniel K. Hogan
Hoganmcdaniel
contact info
Sander L. Esserman
Stutzman & Bromberg
contact info
David A. Klingler
Stutzman, Bromberg, Esserman & Plifka
contact info
Jeremiah Lowe
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Adam Ellis
Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Chu
Ladah Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
Kenneth Lee
Represented By
Brian J. McLaughlin
Offit Kurman, PA
contact info
Creditor
Jo-Ann Leeming
Represented By
Daniel K. Hogan
Hoganmcdaniel
contact info
Sander L. Esserman
Stutzman & Bromberg
contact info
David A. Klingler
Stutzman, Bromberg, Esserman & Plifka
contact info
Jeremiah Lowe
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Adam Ellis
Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Chu
Ladah Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
Live Calls Network, LLC
7910 Woodmont Avenue Suite 1350
Bethesda, MD 20814
Represented By
Jamie Kent Hamelburg
Press, Dozier & Hamelburg, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Desiree Lopez
2035 S. Rene Drive
Santa Ana, CA 92704
Represented By
Ann M. Kashishian
Kashishian Law LLC
contact info
Creditor
Carmen Navarro
Represented By
Shelley A. Kinsella
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Creditor
MRT of Nevada-ATF, LLC
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Leighton Aiken
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Creditor
MRT of Texas-ATF, LLC
Represented By
John D. Demmy
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
contact info
Leighton Aiken
Ferguson Braswell Fraser Kubasta PC
contact info
Creditor
Jennifer Maddock
27817 Hazel
Mission Viego, CA 92691
Represented By
Kaveh Sam Elihu, Elihu
Employee Justice Legal Group, PC
contact info
Creditor
De Lage Landen Financial Services, Inc.
315 Deaderick Street Ste 1700
Nashville, TN 37238
Represented By
Joseph P. Rusnak
Tune, Entrekin & White
contact info
Creditor
UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Eric S. Goldstein
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Gregory Joseph Flasser
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
United States of America
Represented By
Alexander Kalyniuk
Tax Division, U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Catriona Madalyn Coppler
U.S. Department Of Justice, Tax Division
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division
E. Stuart Phillips PO Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Edith Stuart Phillips
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N. Stemmons Freeway Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Helen Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
TN Dept of Treasury - Unclaimed Property
Bankruptcy Division PO Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Elizabeth Alatorre
20042 Beach Blvd.,
Huntington Beach, CA 92648
Represented By
Maribel Ullrich
Law Offices Of Maribel Ullrich
contact info
Creditor
American Express National Bank, c/o Zwicker & Associates, P.C.
80 Minuteman Road P.O. Box 9043
Andover, MA 01810
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Arlington ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Eboney Cobb
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins Mott LLP
contact info
Creditor
Beckman Coulter Inc.
Bernstein-Burkley, P.C. Kirk B. Burkley 707 Grant Street Suite 2200 Gulf Tower
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
Represented By
Kirk B. Burkley
Bernstein-Burkley, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Borough of Ringwood
Represented By
Robert Saul Molnar
Robert Saul Molnar, Esq.
contact info
Creditor
Cathy Bosek
Chris's Plumber Service 6404 US Hwy 301 S
Riverview, FL 33578
Creditor
Sid Coleman Construction, LLC
Represented By
Rosamond Hawkins Posey
Mitchell Mcnutt & Sams
contact info
Creditor
Scott and Kim Sanders
Represented By
Daniel K. Hogan
Hoganmcdaniel
contact info
Sander L. Esserman
Stutzman & Bromberg
contact info
David A. Klingler
Stutzman, Bromberg, Esserman & Plifka
contact info
Jeremiah Lowe
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Adam Ellis
Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Chu
Ladah Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
Donna Burstyn
Represented By
William A. Hazeltine
Sullivan Hazeltine Allinson LLC
contact info
Creditor
San Diego K4, LLC
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Creditor
San Diego Gas and Electric Company, Tampa Electric Company, Peoples Gas System, Boston Gas Company, Massachusetts Electric Company, Narragansett Electric Company and Jersey Central Power & Light Compa
Attn: William F. Taylor, Jr., Esq. 405 N. King Street, 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr.
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Shannon Dougherty Humiston
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Constellation New Energy, Inc.
1310 Point Street 12th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21231
Creditor
RDAlabs LLC
Creditor
Kathy Deem
Represented By
Daniel K. Hogan
Hoganmcdaniel
contact info
Sander L. Esserman
Stutzman & Bromberg
contact info
David A. Klingler
Stutzman, Bromberg, Esserman & Plifka
contact info
Jeremiah Lowe
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Adam Ellis
Panish, Shea & Boyle LLP
contact info
Joseph C. Chu
Ladah Law Firm
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Jamie P. Clare
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Seth Van Aalten
Cole Schotz, P.C.
contact info
Jason R. Melzer
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Joseph Barbiere
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Justin R. Alberto
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Leo V. Leyva
Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard
contact info
Elizabeth A. Carbone
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Andrew John Roth-Moore
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Michael Trentin
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Anthony De Leo
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Health Care Ombudsman
David N. Crapo
One Gateway Center
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
David N. Crapo
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Howard A. Cohen
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Kirk Manz
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Atlanta Regional Office 950 East Paces Ferry Road, NE Suite 900
Atlanta, GA 30326
Represented By
David W. Baddley
U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Term Lenders
Represented By
Matthew Barry Lunn
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Sayan Bhattacharyya
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Matthew Garofalo
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Emily L. Kuznick
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Robert F. Poppiti, Jr.
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Daniel A. Fliman
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
contact info
Interested Party
AdCare Holding Trust
Represented By
William W. Kannel
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky
contact info
Interested Party
Ankura Trust Company, LLC, in its capacity as DIP Agent, Senior Agent, and Junior Agent
Represented By
Todd C. Meyers
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Kelly Moynihan
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
GianClaudio Finizio
Bayard, P.A.
contact info
Amanda R. Steele
Richards, Layton And Finger
contact info
Interested Party
Jerry D. Bostelman
Represented By
Matthew O Talmo
Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
Lucius E. Burch
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
Michael T. Cartwright
Represented By
Matthew O Talmo
Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
Certain Wrongful Death Claimants
Represented By
Daniel K. Hogan
Hoganmcdaniel
contact info
Interested Party
Darryl Rouson
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
Kelly DaSilva
Represented By
Kathleen M. Miller
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Indiana Public Retirement Systems as Lead Plaintiff and the Proposed Class
Represented By
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Michael Seth Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Andrew Behlmann
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Kevin Scott Mann
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Lucius E. Burch, Jerry D. Bostelman, Michael T. Cartwright, Andrew W. McWilliams, Robert Nash, and the Honorable Darryl Rouson
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
Michael Blackburn, Larry Cash, Darrell Freeman, David Hillis, David Kloeppel and Richard Ragsdale
Represented By
L. Katherine Good
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
R. Stephen McNeill
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Aaron H. Stulman
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Special Restructuring Committee of the Board of Directors of AAC Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Sean A. O'Neal
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Gibbons P.C.
Represented By
David N. Crapo
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Natasha M. Songonuga
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Rosa Sierra-Fox
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Juliet M. Sarkessian
U.S. Trustee'S Office
contact info
Rosa Sierra
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
993 993 2 pgs claims Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11 Tue 01/24 12:57 PM
Withdrawal of Claim #1257 by Commissioner of Massachusetts Department of Revenue . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]