Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:20-bk-16792
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2020
Claims Deadline:Sep 01, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Odyssey Leasing, LLC
8050 NW 90th St
Medley, FL 33166-2114
Represented By
David R. Softness
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 06/22/2020 8:00 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 06/23 4:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-16792 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 36916896. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Tue 06/23 4:22 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] Proofs of Claim due by 09/1/2020. (Softness, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 06/23 4:22 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Odyssey Leasing, LLC. (Softness, David)
Related: [-]