Joint Admin
|
1:20-bk-16792 - Odyssey Leasing, LLC
|
06/23/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
1:20-bk-16797 - Odyssey Real Estate Holdings, LLC
|
06/23/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
1:20-bk-16798 - JA Aerocell LLC
|
06/23/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
1:20-bk-16799 - 8130 Acquisition Corporation, LLC
|
06/23/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
1:20-bk-16800 - Savanna Leasing, LLC
|
06/23/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
1:20-bk-16802 - AB Financial Services, LLC
|
06/23/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
1:20-bk-16805 - Turbine Engine Center, Inc.
|
06/23/2020
|
Joint Admin
|
1:20-bk-16806 - Miami NDT, Inc.
|
06/23/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:20-ap-01347 - Odyssey Leasing, LLC v. Preferred Bank
|
09/03/2020
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01264 - Kapila v. Aero Direct, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01265 - Kapila v. Aerospace Equity Group, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01266 - Kapila v. AeroThrust Holdings, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01267 - Kapila v. M-DOT AVIATION LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01268 - Kapila v. Airfoils, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01269 - Kapila v. Airline Transportation Specialists, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01270 - Kapila v. Alsco, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01271 - Kapila v. Altus Global Aviation, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01273 - Kapila v. MENA TRAVEL AGENCY
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01274 - Kapila v. Gardner
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01275 - Kapila v. Array Aviation, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01276 - Kapila v. MK AVIATION, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01277 - Kapila v. Atec, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01278 - Kapila v. Avioserv San Diego, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01279 - Kapila v. Aviotek Instruments & Accessories, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01280 - Kapila v. MM AERO CONSULTING, INC.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01281 - Kapila v. Barclaycard US
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01282 - Kapila v. Barnes Aerospace
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01283 - Kapila v. Barnes Group, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01284 - Kapila v. Bedford Advisors, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01285 - Kapila v. BMO Harris Bank N.A.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01286 - Kapila v. BTX Global Logistics
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01287 - Kapila v. CAPITAL ONE BANK, N.A.,
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01288 - Kapila v. CFM56 VENTURES, LLC,
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01289 - Kapila v. CKRE LIMITED
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01290 - Kapila v. COMCAST
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01291 - Kapila v. COORDINATE EQUIPMENT LEASING, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01292 - Kapila v. St. John
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01293 - Kapila v. DAMON ADVISORS, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01294 - Kapila v. DEPORTIVA 52, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01295 - Kapila v. Novo Aero Services LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01296 - Kapila v. DIVA AVIATION HOLDINGS, LLC,
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01297 - Kapila v. DYNAMIC MITIGATION CORP.,
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01298 - Kapila v. EATON CORPORATION
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01299 - Kapila v. EB AIRFOIL, LLC,
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01300 - Kapila v. EGAN-JONES RATINGS COMPANY,
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01301 - Kapila v. Ellsworth Adhesives
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01302 - Kapila v. Perimeter International, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01303 - Kapila v. Polaris Turbine Services, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01304 - Kapila v. Pat Duggins Consulting Services, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01305 - Kapila v. Juno Engines Cayman, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01306 - Kapila v. EMC3 Consulting, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01307 - Kapila v. Emerson Cress, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01308 - Kapila v. Miami NDT Delta Leasing l, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01309 - Kapila v. Far East Aviation Group, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01310 - Kapila v. Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01311 - Kapila v. Hill
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01312 - Kapila v. Gap Ventures, LLC,
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01313 - Kapila v. GGG Partners, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01314 - Kapila v. Global Engine Stands, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01315 - Kapila v. Herber Aircraft Service, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01316 - Kapila v. M & A Capital Ventures, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01317 - Kapila v. The Har-Conn Chrome Company
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01318 - Kapila v. Hurley Aviation Services, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01319 - Kapila v. International Aviation Assets, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01321 - Kapila v. Informa Media, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01322 - Kapila v. Stevens Global Logistics
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01323 - Kapila v. Rutas Aereas LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01324 - Kapila v. Islander Supply, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01325 - Kapila v. The Risk Management Group, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01326 - Kapila v. Vibrant Corporation
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01327 - Kapila v. Tridas Air, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01328 - Kapila v. Whitefield Captial Partners
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01329 - Kapila v. Willlis Aeronautical Services, Inc
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01330 - Kapila v. Triton Logistics, Inc
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01331 - Kapila v. Windrow, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01332 - Kapila v. Wishpets, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01333 - Kapila v. Triumph Accessory Services
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01334 - Kapila v. Bowthorpe
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01335 - Kapila v. Tetra Financial Group LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01336 - Kapila v. Tauro Limited Partnership
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01337 - Kapila v. Integrity Aviation and Leasing, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01338 - Kapila v. Twin Manufacturing Company
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01339 - Kapila v. St. Reme Aviation
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01340 - Kapila v. SAAD Productions, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01341 - Kapila v. Standard Aero Holdings, Inc.
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01342 - Kapila v. Hurley
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01343 - Kapila v. MFG Investments, LLC
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01344 - Kapila v. Janiakl
|
09/27/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01346 - Kapila v. ODYSSEY LEASING III, LLC
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01347 - Kapila v. Stewart Industries International et al
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01348 - Kapila v. TWIN MANUFACTURING COMPANY
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01349 - Kapila v. AERONAUTICAL TITLE AND ESCROW SERVICE, LLC
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01350 - Kapila v. DIAMOND AVIATION FINANCE & LEASING, LLC
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01351 - Kapila v. JGB PARTNERS, L.P. d/b/a JGB Partners Sub
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01352 - Kapila v. THINKWISE TECHNOLOGY, INC et al
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01353 - Kapila v. Lelac Aerospace, LLC
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01354 - Kapila v. Safran Test Cells
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01355 - Kapila v. Boyer
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01356 - Kapila v. Prescient Capital Partners Ltd.
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01357 - Kapila v. Jet Engine Technology Corp.
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01358 - Kapila v. Unified Aviation Solutions Enterprise, Inc et al
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01359 - Kapila v. Xtreme Aviation, LLC
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01360 - Kapila v. Smiths Tubular Systems-Laconia, Inc. a/k/a Smiths
|
09/28/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01361 - Kapila v. Odyssey Leasing III, LLC
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01362 - Kapila v. Coppenrath et al
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01364 - Kapila v. Pacific Aerodynamic, Inc.
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01365 - Kapila v. CFM International, Inc.
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01366 - Kapila v. Monroe Capital Management Advisors, LLC
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01367 - Kapila v. Global Aerospace Enterprises, Inc.
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01368 - Kapila v. Toyota Industries Commercial Finance, Inc.
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01369 - Kapila v. Avocet Aviation Services, LLC
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01370 - Kapila v. Roush Aviation Services
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01371 - Kapila v. Pratt & Whitney Engine Services, Inc.
|
09/29/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01432 - Kapila v. RSB Aero, LLC et al
|
11/21/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-01433 - Kapila v. Supreme Parts Repair, LLC
|
11/21/2022
|