Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:20-bk-16797
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2020
Creditor Meeting:Dec 28, 2021
Claims Deadline:Dec 17, 2021
Converted:Sep 29, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Odyssey Real Estate Holdings, LLC
8050 NW 90th St
Medley, FL 33166-2114
Represented By
David R. Softness
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Soneet Kapila
www.kapilatrustee.com PO Box 14213
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33302
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130
Represented By
Steven D Schneiderman
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2023 12:49 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 06/23 4:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-16797 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 36916896. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Tue 06/23 4:36 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] Proofs of Claim due by 09/1/2020. (Softness, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 06/23 4:36 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Odyssey Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Softness, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Transfer Case (Intra-District) Tue 06/23 9:49 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Case To Miami Division (to Judge Mark) Filed by Debtor Odyssey Real Estate Holdings, LLC (Softness, David)
Related: [-]