Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-16772

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:20-bk-16802
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2020
Claims Deadline:Sep 01, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
JA Aerocell LLC
8050 NW 90th St
Medley, FL 33166-2114
Represented By
David R. Softness
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 06/22/2020 8:00 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 06/23 5:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-16802 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 36917160. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Tue 06/23 5:38 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] Proofs of Claim due by 09/1/2020. (Softness, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 06/23 5:38 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor JA Aerocell LLC. (Softness, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Tue 06/23 9:25 PM
Notice of Filing Corrected Petition , Filed by Debtor JA Aerocell LLC Related [+]. (Softness, David)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
4 4 motion Transfer Case (Intra-District) Tue 06/23 9:43 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Case To Miami Division (Judge Mark) and to Correct Caption Filed by Debtor JA Aerocell LLC (Softness, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Transfer Case (Intra-District) Tue 06/23 9:44 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Case To Miami Division (to Judge Mark) and to Correct Caption Filed by Debtor JA Aerocell LLC (Softness, David)
Related: [-]