Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11662

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:20-bk-11666
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2020
Terminated:Dec 03, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
General Nutrition Corporation
300 6th Ave
Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2514
Represented By
Kara Hammond Coyle
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Thursday, December 03, 2020
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 12/03 3:04 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
17 17 order Final Decree Wed 12/02 3:01 PM
Order And Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Non-Lead Debtors Signed on 12/2/2020 (AJL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2020
16 16 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Tue 12/01 6:16 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Liquidating Debtors Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 350(a), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Del. Bankr. L.R. 3022-1 for Order and Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases of Consolidated Non-Lead Debtors and Waiving Requirement of Further Post-Confirmation Reports in Those Cases Related [+] Filed by META Advisors, Inc.. (Flasser, Gregory)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, November 13, 2020
15 15 motion Final Decree - Motion Fri 11/13 7:07 PM
Motion for Final Decree // Motion of Liquidating Debtors Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 350(a), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Del. Bankr. L.R. 3022-1 for Order and Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases of Consolidated Non-Lead Debtors and Waiving Requirement of Further Post-Confirmation Reports in Those Cases Filed by Vitamin OldCo, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/30/2020. (Fay, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
14 14 6 pgs order Order Wed 10/14 1:30 PM
Order (A) Dismissing Case of GNC China Holdco, LLC and (B) Amending Debtors' Case Caption. An order has been entered in these cases directing that the caption of these cases be changed, in accordance with the corporate name change of General Nutrition Corporation to Vitamin OldCo, Inc. (f/k/a General Nutrition Corporation). Order Signed on 10/14/2020. (Mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
13 13 crditcrd none Tue 09/08 6:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements 20-11666 KBO) [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00). Receipt Number 9951057, amount $ 31.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Amended Schedules/Statements Tue 09/08 5:51 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements filed: Sch E-F, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Fee Amount $31. Filed by General Nutrition Corporation. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
11 11 misc Request for Service of Notices Thu 08/27 12:08 PM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by WBC Partners Delaware, LLC. (Bingham, Darwin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
10 10 misc Request for Service of Notices Thu 07/30 5:02 PM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by The District, L.C., Boyer Heber City. (Bingham, Darwin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
9 9 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 07/22 11:44 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by General Nutrition Corporation. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 07/22 1:19 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by General Nutrition Corporation. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 17, 2020
7 7 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 07/17 6:43 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by CIELO PASO PARKE GREEN, L.P.. (Ehrlich, Herbert)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 07/17 6:41 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by EP MARCUS INVESTMENTS, L.P.. (Ehrlich, Herbert)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 07/17 6:29 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by EP MARCUS INVESTMENTS, L.P.. (Ehrlich, Herbert)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 07/17 6:26 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Original Del Mesa Partners, L.P.. (Ehrlich, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 06/24 6:53 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of GNC Holdings, Inc., Case No. 20-11662 (KBO), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-11662 (KBO) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 6/24/2020 (Mml)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/24 1:33 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-11666 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9843149, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 06/24 7:42 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
1 1 22 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 06/23 10:32 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by General Nutrition Corporation. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]