Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:20-bk-11662
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Oct 14, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
GNC Holdings, Inc.
300 6th Ave
Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2514
Represented By
Kara Hammond Coyle
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


1. GNC filing for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (wilx.com)
Submitted Thu 06/25/2020
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
2267 2267 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 05/12 1:55 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Engels Medina Regarding Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation by and Between the Plan Administrator and GRE Coralwood, L.P. Modifying the Automatic Stay to Effectuate Setoff and Allowance of Claim, and Order Approving Stipulation by and Between the Plan Administrator and GRE Coralwood, L.P. Modifying the Automatic Stay to Effectuate Setoff and Allowance of Claim . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 2261 ,2262
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
2266 2266 order Extend Time Wed 05/07 1:48 PM
Order Extending to October 20, 2025: (I) the Claims Objection Deadline; and (II) the Deadline to Object to Requests for Payment of Administrative Claims Related [+] Order Signed on 5/7/2025. (Mml)
Related: [-] 2257 ,2265
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
2265 2265 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 05/06 7:39 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Liquidating Debtors for an Order Further Extending to October 20, 2025: (I) the Claims Objection Deadline; and (II) the Deadline to Object to Requests for Payment of Administrative Claims Related [+] Filed by META Advisors, Inc., Meta Advisors, Inc.. (Walsh, Steven)
Related: [-] 2257
2264 2264 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 05/06 5:17 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Engels Medina Regarding Motion of Liquidating Debtors for an Order Further Extending to October 20, 2025: (I) the Claims Objection Deadline; and (II) the Deadline to Object to Requests for Payment of Administrative Claims . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 2257
2263 2263 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 05/06 12:03 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Date . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 2258
Monday, May 05, 2025
2262 2262 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/05 4:50 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By and Between the Plan Administrator and GRE Coralwood, L.P. Modifying the Automatic Stay to Effectuate Setoff and Allowance of Claim Related [+] Order Signed on 5/5/2025. (Mml)
Related: [-] 2261
Att: 1 Exhibit 1