Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11662

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:20-bk-11671
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2020
Dismissed:Oct 14, 2020
Terminated:Oct 30, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of CreditorsOver 100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
GNC China Holdco LLC
300 6th Ave
Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2514
Represented By
Kara Hammond Coyle
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Friday, October 30, 2020
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 10/30 10:01 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (AJL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
8 8 6 pgs order Order Wed 10/14 5:00 PM
Order (A) Dismissing Case of GNC China Holdco, LLC and (B) Amending Debtors' Case Caption. Order Signed on 10/14/2020. (Mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
7 7 crditcrd none Tue 09/08 6:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements 20-11671 KBO) [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00). Receipt Number 9951057, amount $ 31.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Amended Schedules/Statements Tue 09/08 5:55 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements filed: Sch E-F, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Fee Amount $31. Filed by GNC China Holdco LLC. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 07/22 12:12 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by GNC China Holdco LLC. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 07/22 1:23 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by GNC China Holdco LLC. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 24, 2020
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 06/24 6:53 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of GNC Holdings, Inc., Case No. 20-11662 (KBO), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-11662 (KBO) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 6/24/2020 (Mml)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/24 1:34 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-11671 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9843149, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Wed 06/24 7:42 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
1 1 19 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 06/23 10:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by GNC China Holdco LLC. (Hammond Coyle, Kara)
Related: [-]