Vitamin OldCo Government Services, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11662
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-11662
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Karen B Owens |
Case #: | 1:20-bk-11676 |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | Over 100,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
GNC Government Services, LLC
300 6th Ave
Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2514 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago |
Thursday, December 03, 2020 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 12/03 3:43 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SS) |
||
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order And Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Non-Lead Debtors Signed on 12/2/2020 (AJL) |
|
Tuesday, December 01, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Liquidating Debtors Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 350(a), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Del. Bankr. L.R. 3022-1 for Order and Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases of Consolidated Non-Lead Debtors and Waiving Requirement of Further Post-Confirmation Reports in Those Cases Filed by META Advisors, Inc.. (Flasser, Gregory) |
|
Friday, November 13, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Motion for Final Decree //Motion of Liquidating Debtors Under 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 350(a), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022, and Del. Bankr. L.R. 3022-1 for Order and Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases of Consolidated Non-Lead Debtors and Waiving Requirement of Further Post-Confirmation Reports in Those Cases Filed by META Advisors, Inc., Vitamin OldCo Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/30/2020. (Fay, Erin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 14, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order (A) Dismissing Case of GNC China Holdco, LLC and (B) Amending Debtors' Case Caption. An order has been entered in these cases directing that the caption of these cases be changed, in accordance with the corporate name change of GNC Government Services, LLC to Vitamin OldCo Government Services, LLC (f/k/a GNC Government Services LLC). Order Signed on 10/14/2020. (Mml) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
crditcrd
none
Tue 09/08 6:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements 20-11676 KBO) [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00). Receipt Number 9951057, amount $ 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Amended Schedules/Statements filed: Sch E-F, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Fee Amount $31. Filed by GNC Government Services, LLC. (Hammond Coyle, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by GNC Government Services, LLC. (Hammond Coyle, Kara) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by GNC Government Services, LLC. (Hammond Coyle, Kara) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Fri 06/26 12:31 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 20-11676 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9847282, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of GNC Holdings, Inc., Case No. 20-11662 (KBO), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 20-11662 (KBO) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 6/24/2020 (Mml) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Wed 06/24 7:42 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (LB) |
||
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by GNC Government Services, LLC. (Hammond Coyle, Kara) |