Plains Marketing, L.P. v. Sklar Exploration Company, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-01191 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Jun 24, 2020 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sklar Exploration Company, LLC
5395 Pearl Parkway Suite 200
Boulder, CO 80301 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lufkin Industries, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Plains Marketing, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:05 PM MDT |
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/09 11:58 AM
Adversary Case Number 20-01191 EEB Closed. (sd) |
||
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion)
Fri 07/23 8:56 AM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice . (sd) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 07/23 8:58 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 20-01191 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 8/6/2021. (sd) |
||
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 07/21 8:40 PM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Plains Marketing, L.P. . (Neiman, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 11/25 10:24 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/25/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 11/23 4:53 PM
Copy of Order Approving Global Settlement Agreement to Resolve Adversary Proceeding. . (saa) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 09/30 10:42 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 28, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/28 2:21 PM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion Of Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. And Ge Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP For Extension Of Time To Respond To Cross-Claims GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 10/9/2020; Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. Answer Due 10/9/2020; Lufkin Industries, LLC Answer Due 10/9/2020 . (sd) |
|
Friday, September 25, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/25 4:19 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. . (Mohan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Sunday, September 13, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 09/13 10:20 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/13/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
22 | 22
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/11 9:22 AM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion Of Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. And GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP For Extension Of Time To Respond To Cross-Claims GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 9/25/2020; Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. Answer Due 9/25/2020; Lufkin Industries, LLC Answer Due 9/25/2020 . (sd) Modified on 9/14/2020 (sd) |
|
Thursday, September 10, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/10 10:56 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. . (Mohan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Sunday, August 30, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/30 10:24 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/30/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/28 2:49 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint for Defendants GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 9/11/2020; Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. Answer Due 9/11/2020; Lufkin Industries, LLC Answer Due 9/11/2020 . (mmg) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/28 7:41 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. . (Mohan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
17 | 17
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Fri 08/28 7:33 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Timothy Mohan is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 16: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Adversary > Motion > Extend Time To File Answer To Complaint. Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . (sd) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extend Time (Adversary)
Thu 08/27 5:58 PM
Docketed in error using the incorrect event. Refer to Doc. #18 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To September 11, 2020 Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc.. (Mohan, Timothy) Modified on 8/28/2020 (sd) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Tuesday, August 25, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Tue 08/25 2:44 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Plains Marketing, L.P. . (Neiman, Kevin) |
|
Sunday, August 16, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/16 10:20 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 14, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extend Time (Adversary)
Fri 08/14 10:02 AM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion Of Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. And GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP For Extension Of Time To Respond To Cross-Claims . Document due by 8/28/2020 for8 , (sd) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend Time (Adversary)
Thu 08/13 9:24 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To August 28, 2020 Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc.. (Mohan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Wednesday, August 12, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Wed 08/12 1:17 PM
Answer to Crossclaim Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Plains Marketing, L.P. . (Neiman, Kevin) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
answer|cmp|cmp
Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim|Crossclaim
Fri 08/07 1:23 PM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. against Lufkin Industries, LLC, Plains Marketing, L.P., Sklar Exploration Company, LLC, Crossclaim by GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. against Lufkin Industries, LLC, Sklar Exploration Company, LLC Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. . (Mohan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit GE Lien Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Kelley Lien Affidavits | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Plains - GE Notice Letter | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Plains - Kelley Notice Letters | ||
Sunday, July 26, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 07/27 8:46 AM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/26/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer|cmp|cmp
Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim|Crossclaim
Fri 07/24 2:08 PM
Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Sklar Exploration Company, LLC against GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc., Lufkin Industries, LLC, Plains Marketing, L.P., Crossclaim by Sklar Exploration Company, LLC against GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc., Lufkin Industries, LLC, Plains Marketing, L.P. Filed by Jenny M.F. Fujii on behalf of Sklar Exploration Company, LLC . (Fujii, Jenny) |
|
7 | 7
order
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/24 11:23 AM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion Of Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. And Ge Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 8/7/2020; Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. Answer Due 8/7/2020; Lufkin Industries, LLC Answer Due 8/7/2020 . (sd) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/23 12:21 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Timothy C. Mohan on behalf of GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. . (Mohan, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
misc
Summons Service Executed (Adversary)
Thu 06/25 4:18 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Sklar Exploration Company, LLC (6/25/20); Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. (6/25/20); GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP (6/25/20); and Lufkin Industries, LLC (6/25/20) Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Plains Marketing, L.P.. (Neiman, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, June 24, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1)
Wed 06/24 8:57 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Corporate Parents Added to Case: Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.. Filed by Kevin S. Neiman on behalf of Plains Marketing, L.P.. (Neiman, Kevin) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Wed 06/24 8:52 PM
Summons Issued on GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP Answer Due 07/24/2020; Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc. Answer Due 07/24/2020; Lufkin Industries, LLC Answer Due 07/24/2020; Sklar Exploration Company, LLC Answer Due 07/24/2020. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Neiman, Kevin) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 06/24 8:51 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 20-01191 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B28952811. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/24 8:48 PM
Adversary case 20-01191 Complaint by Plains Marketing, L.P. against Sklar Exploration Company, LLC, Kelley Brothers Contractors, Inc., GE Oil & Gas Pressure Control LP, Lufkin Industries, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 10/22/2020 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Neiman, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 86 pgs Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 |