Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Romero
Case #: 1:20-bk-12377
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Aug 24, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sklar Exploration Company, LLC
5395 Pearl Pkwy Ste 200
Boulder, CO 80301-2541
Represented By
Lee M. Kutner
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
2110 2110 notice Notice to Substitute Attorney Thu 05/15 11:00 AM
Notice to Substitute Attorney. Stephen T. Loden Added to Case. Christopher D. Johnson Terminated From Case. Filed by Stephen T Loden on behalf of Thomas M. Kim... (Loden, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
2109 2109 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/14 10:19 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 66. Notice Date 05/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2108 Order on Objection to Claim
Monday, May 12, 2025
2108 2108 order Objection to Claim Mon 05/12 3:31 PM
Order Partially Granting Omnibus Objection To Certain SatisfiedClaims Related [+]. (bw)
Related: [-] 2099 Objection to Claim
Friday, May 09, 2025
2107 2107 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report Fri 05/09 9:42 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Sklar Exploration Company, LLC. (Riley, Keri)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
2106 2106 misc Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Thu 05/08 7:17 PM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Amalia Y Sax-Bolder on behalf of Sklarco, LLC Related [+]. (Sax-Bolder, Amalia)
Related: [-] 2099 Objection to Claim
2105 2105 notice Notice Thu 05/08 7:08 PM
Notice Re: of Submission of Revised Proposed Order Granting Omnibus Objection to Certain Satisfied Claims. Filed by Amalia Y Sax-Bolder on behalf of Sklarco, LLC Related [+]... (Sax-Bolder, Amalia)
Related: [-] 2099 Objection to Claim
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redline Revised Proposed Order