TriplePlay Transport, LLC v. MDC Energy LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50637 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
MDC Energy LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
MDC Texas Operator LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Natixis, New York Branch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TriplePlay Transport, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 06/26 3:55 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50637 Closed (DMC) |
||
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
![]() An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding directing the procedural consolidation of this adversary proceeding pending under Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS). The docket in Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters concerning this adversary proceeding. Order Signed on 8/7/2020 (Murin, Leslie) |
|
7 | 7
![]() ORDER (I) PROCEDURALLY CONSOLIDATINGADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS, AND (II) SETTINGCERTAIN DEADLINES WITH RESPECT THERETO Order Signed on 8/7/2020. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Consolidate Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett) |
|
Monday, July 06, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by TriplePlay Transport, LLC. (Demmy, John) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants MDC Energy LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 9/4/2020. (Demmy, John) |
|
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 07/02 11:58 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50637 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9856734, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50637 Complaint and Request for Declaratory Judgment to Determine Validity, Priority, and Extent of Liens on the Debtors' Property by TriplePlay Transport, LLC against MDC Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)). (Demmy, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |