Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50133

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Gregory R Schaaf
Case #: 5:20-ap-05025
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2020
Terminated:Sep 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
GenCanna Global, Inc.
321 Venable Road, Suite 2
Winchester, KY 40391
Represented By
GenCanna Global, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Electronic Restoration Services, Inc.
12001 Levan Road
Livonia, MI 48150
Represented By
Harvey Altus
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, March 25, 2021
16 16 utility Affidavit Thu 03/25 12:37 PM
Affidavit of, filed by Electronic Restoration Services, Inc.. (Altus, Harvey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 22, 2021
15 15 order Pay Filing Fee Mon 03/22 2:43 PM
Order to Pay Filing Fee. Related [+]. Filing Fee due by 3/25/2021. (bjp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Electronic Restoration Services, Inc.
Thursday, September 03, 2020
court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/03 1:39 PM
Adversary Proceeding 20-5025 Closed. (rah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
14 14 utility Stipulation Tue 08/18 5:21 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding , filed by OGGUSA, Inc.. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 06, 2020
13 13 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/06 3:40 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding, filed by OGGUSA, Inc.. Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Adversary scheduled for 8/20/2020 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (Irving, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 20, 2020
12 12 utility Certificate of Service Mon 07/20 11:06 AM
Certificate of Service Summons, Amended Complaint and Order for Trial , filed by Harvey Altus Related [+]. (Altus, Harvey)
Related: [-] 6 Order for Trial,7 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Electronic Restoration Services, Inc.,9 Alias Summons Issued
Thursday, July 16, 2020
11 11 epo Deficiency re Signature Thu 07/16 11:23 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having reviewed the Certificate of Service [ECF No. 10 ] and finding that the pleading does not meet the requirements as set forth by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9011(a) and/or Section VI of the [LINK:Administrative Procedures Manual] , specifically, Document does not contain a signature. It is ORDERED that said pleading may be STRICKEN from the record unless the deficiency is corrected within 7 days from the entry of this Order. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Date due: 7/23/2020.(kaya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
10 10 utility Supplemental Document Wed 07/15 3:46 PM
Supplemental Document, Exhibits 1-3 to Amended Complaint , filed by Electronic Restoration Services, Inc.. (Altus, Harvey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service of Amended Complaint and Order for Trial
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
9 9 cmp Alias Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Tue 07/14 12:09 PM
Summons Re-Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2020
8 8 court Entry Fri 07/10 12:53 PM
Entry - The Amended Complaint references exhibits that have not been provided. Filer to correct if necessary. Related [+]. (bjp)
Related: [-] 7 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Electronic Restoration Services, Inc.
Thursday, July 09, 2020
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/09 6:20 PM
Amended Complaint by Electronic Restoration Services, Inc. against GenCanna Global USA, Inc. Related [+] (Altus, Harvey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Electronic Restoration Services, Inc.
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
6 6 order Trial Wed 07/08 4:35 PM
Order for Trial. Trial date set for 11/24/2020 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (bjp) Attorney for Plaintiff(s)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 07, 2020
5 5 court Entry Tue 07/07 9:27 AM
Entry - The Complaint references exhibits that have not been provided. Filer to correct if necessary. Related [+]. (bjp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Electronic Restoration Services, Inc.
Thursday, July 02, 2020
4 4 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Thu 07/02 11:26 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (bjp)
Related: [-]
3 3 epo Discrepancy re Complaint Thu 07/02 11:16 AM
Deficiency - Action Required It appears from the record that the electronic docket entry filed on July 1, 2020, and the PDF document associated with it contain one or more of the following discrepancies: Other: The debtor's name in the complaint caption does not match the name of the debtor listed in ECF. It is ORDERED that the above-listed discrepancies shall be corrected within 7 days of entry of this order, either by filing an amended PDF document if the error was contained within the original PDF, or by filing an affidavit stating what the correct information should be if the error was made by failing to enter, or incorrectly entering the information into the ECF system. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf Date due: 7/9/2020 .(bjp)
Related: [-]
2 2 epo File Statement re: Consent (Complaints, etc.) Thu 07/02 10:34 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a complaint, counterclaim, cross-claim, third-party complaint and notice of removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the bankruptcy court. It appearing to the Court that Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs Electronic Restoration Services, Inc. to file a notice regarding consent within 7 days of the entry of this Order in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. Date due: 7/9/2020.(bjp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/01 1:50 PM
Adversary case 20-05025 Complaint, filed by Electronic Restoration Services, Inc. against GenCanna Global, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (Altus, Harvey) Modified on 7/2/2020 (bjp)
Related: [-]