American Hospital Association, et al v. Alex Azar, II
Original Case: 1:19-cv-03619
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cvus-05193 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2020 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 30, 2020 3:31 AM EST |
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The North Carolina Healthcare Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Maine Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Massachusetts Health and Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Michigan Health & Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Mississippi Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Missouri Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Montana Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Nebraska Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Nevada Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The New Hampshire Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The New Jersey Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The New Mexico Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Healthcare Association of New York State
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Greater New York Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Louisiana Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The North Dakota Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Ohio Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Oregon Association of Hospitals and Health Systems
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Hospital and Healthsystem Association of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The South Carolina Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The South Dakota Association of Healthcare Organizations
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Tennessee Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Texas Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Washington State Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The West Virginia Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Wisconsin Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Wyoming Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Healthcare Financial Management Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Kentucky Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Alaska State Hospital & Nursing Home Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Arizona Hospital and Healthcare Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Arkansas Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The California Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Connecticut Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The District of Columbia Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Georgia Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Kansas Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Iowa Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Illinois Health and Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
The Healthcare Association of Hawaii
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellant
Florida Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Association of Mature American Citizens
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Texas Public Policy Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Free2Care
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Independent Women's Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
PatientRightsAdvocate.org
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Alex M. Azar, II, in his official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
American Hospital Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bothwell Regional Health Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Providence Health System - Southern California, d/b/a Providence Holy Cross Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Memorial Community Hospital and Health System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Association of Children's Hospitals
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Federation of American Hospitals
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Association of American Medical Colleges
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/30/2020 3:31 AM EST |
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 20-5193 | ||
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1850006] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-03619-CJN filed by American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Bothwell Regional Health Center, Federation of American Hospitals, Memorial Community Hospital and Health System, National Association of Children's Hospitals and Providence Health System - Southern California. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5193 20-5193 |