Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50647
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2020
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
MDC Energy LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
MDC Energy LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC Texas Operator LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
MDC Texas Operator LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
contact info
Defendant
Natixis, New York Branch
Represented By
Natixis, New York Branch
contact info
Plaintiff
Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC
Represented By
Thomas M. Horan
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/27 2:00 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50647 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
9 9 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:39 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
8 8 24 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 2:11 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding directing the procedural consolidation of this adversary proceeding pending under Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS). The docket in Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters concerning this adversary proceeding. Order Signed on 8/7/2020 (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 12:39 PM
ORDER (I) PROCEDURALLY CONSOLIDATINGADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS, AND (II) SETTINGCERTAIN DEADLINES WITH RESPECT THERETO Related [+] Order Signed on 8/7/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, August 06, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Thu 08/06 4:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
5 5 motion Motion to Consolidate Wed 07/22 2:58 PM
Motion to Consolidate Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2020
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/21 4:54 PM
Amended Complaint to Add additional fact information Filed by Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC Related [+] (Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
Att: 14 Exhibit 14
Att: 15 Exhibit 15
Att: 16 Certificate of Service
Monday, July 06, 2020
3 3 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 07/06 1:41 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants MDC Energy LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 9/4/2020. (Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, July 02, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 07/02 3:00 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50647 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9857376, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 07/02 2:54 PM
Adversary case 20-50647 Complaint And Request For Declaratory Judgment To Determine Validity, Priority, Perfection, Value, And Extent Of Certain Mineral Liens On The Debtors' Property by Stellar Drilling Fluids, LLC against MDC Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/30/2020. (Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
Att: 14 Exhibit 14
Att: 15 Exhibit 15
Att: 16 Summons
Att: 17 Certificate of Service