Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50648
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2020
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
MDC Energy LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
MDC Energy LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC Texas Operator LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
MDC Texas Operator LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
280 East 96th Street Suite 210
Indianapolis, IN 46240
Represented By
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
contact info
Defendant
Natixis, New York Branch
1251 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020
Represented By
Natixis, New York Branch
contact info
Plaintiff
Summit Casing Services, LLC
6575 Corporation Parkway
Fort Worth, TX 76126
Represented By
Morgan L. Patterson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/27 2:02 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50648 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
10 10 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:39 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2020
9 9 notice Substitution of Counsel - Notice Fri 08/28 9:39 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Summit Casing Services, LLC. (Roth-Moore, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
8 8 24 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 2:11 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding directing the procedural consolidation of this adversary proceeding pending under Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS). The docket in Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters concerning this adversary proceeding. Order Signed on 8/7/2020 (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 11:15 AM
ORDER (I) PROCEDURALLY CONSOLIDATINGADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS, AND (II) SETTINGCERTAIN DEADLINES WITH RESPECT THERETO Related [+] Order Signed on 8/7/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, August 06, 2020
6 6 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Thu 08/06 4:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/23 3:54 PM
First Amended Complaint to Add additional fact information Filed by Summit Casing Services, LLC Related [+] (Patterson, Morgan)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Appendix A
Att: 2 Appendix B
Att: 3 Appendix C
Att: 4 Exhibit A
Att: 5 Exhibit B (part 1 of 7)
Att: 6 Exhibit B (part 2 of 7)
Att: 7 Exhibit B (part 3 of 7)
Att: 8 Exhibit B (part 4 of 7)
Att: 9 Exhibit B (part 5 of 7)
Att: 10 Exhibit B (part 6 of 7)
Att: 11 Exhibit B (part 7 of 7)
Att: 12 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
4 4 motion Motion to Consolidate Wed 07/22 2:58 PM
Motion to Consolidate Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 07/02 3:19 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants MDC Energy LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC. and Natixis, New York Branch Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 8/31/2020. (Patterson, Morgan)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 07/02 3:01 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50648 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9857385, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 07/02 3:00 PM
Adversary case 20-50648 Complaint of Summit Casing Services, LLC and Request for Declaratory Judgment to Determine Validity, Priority, and Extent of Mineral Liens on the Debtors' Property by Summit Casing Services, LLC against MDC Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/30/2020. (Patterson, Morgan) Modified Text on 7/2/2020 (LB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A
Att: 2 Appendix B
Att: 3 Appendix C
Att: 4 Exhibit A
Att: 5 Exhibit B (part 1 of 7)
Att: 6 Exhibit B (part 2 of 7)
Att: 7 Exhibit B (part 3 of 7)
Att: 8 Exhibit B (part 4 of 7)
Att: 9 Exhibit B (part 5 of 7)
Att: 10 Exhibit B (part 6 of 7)
Att: 11 Exhibit B (part 7 of 7)