Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50658
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2020
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
MDC ENERGY LLC
Represented By
MDC ENERGY LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC
Represented By
MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC
Represented By
MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC
contact info
Defendant
NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH
Represented By
NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH
contact info
Plaintiff
Legacy Directional Drilling, LLC
Represented By
Brett D. Fallon
Morris James LLP
contact info
Jay R. Bender
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/27 2:29 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50658 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
13 13 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:39 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 14, 2020
12 12 misc Exhibit Wed 10/14 4:40 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Change in Contact Information for Legacy Directional Drilling, LLC Filed by Legacy Directional Drilling, LLC. (Fallon, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/21 7:46 PM
Amended Complaint to Add additional fact information Filed by Legacy Directional Drilling, LLC (Fallon, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 07, 2020
10 10 24 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 2:21 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding directing the procedural consolidation of this adversary proceeding pending under Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS). The docket in Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters concerning this adversary proceeding. Order Signed on 8/7/2020 (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 11:25 AM
ORDER (I) PROCEDURALLY CONSOLIDATINGADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS, AND (II) SETTINGCERTAIN DEADLINES WITH RESPECT THERETO Related [+] Order Signed on 8/7/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, August 06, 2020
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Thu 08/06 4:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2020
7 7 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 07/24 3:00 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice Justin T. Scot Related [+] Order Signed on 7/24/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 07/24 2:22 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Justin T. Scott . Receipt Number 3084429, Filed by Legacy Directional Drilling, LLC. (Fallon, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
5 5 motion Motion to Consolidate Wed 07/22 2:58 PM
Motion to Consolidate Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/08 3:29 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Legacy Directional Drilling, LLC. (Fallon, Brett)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Thursday, July 02, 2020
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 07/02 4:45 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50658 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9857749, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 07/02 4:11 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants MDC ENERGY LLC, MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC, MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC, NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH. Related [+] Tickle due by: 8/31/2020. (Fallon, Brett)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 07/02 3:53 PM
Adversary case 20-50658 Complaint -- Legacy Directional Drilling, LLC's Complaint and Request for Declaratory Judgment to Determine Validity, Priority, and Extent of Mineral Liens on the Debtors' Property by Legacy Directional Drilling, LLC against MDC ENERGY LLC, MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC, MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC, NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)). (Fallon, Brett)
Related: [-]