Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50660
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2020
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
MDC Energy LLC
Represented By
MDC Energy LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC Texas Operator LLC
Represented By
MDC Texas Operator LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
Represented By
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
contact info
Defendant
NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH IN ITS CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE AGENT AND LENDER
Represented By
NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH IN ITS CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE AGENT AND LENDER
contact info
Plaintiff
Globe Chemical, LLC
17171 Park Row Suite 160
HOUSTON, TX 77084
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/27 2:32 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50660 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
8 8 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:39 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 07, 2020
7 7 24 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 2:21 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding directing the procedural consolidation of this adversary proceeding pending under Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS). The docket in Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters concerning this adversary proceeding. Order Signed on 8/7/2020 (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 11:28 AM
ORDER (I) PROCEDURALLY CONSOLIDATINGADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS, AND (II) SETTINGCERTAIN DEADLINES WITH RESPECT THERETO Related [+] Order Signed on 8/7/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, August 06, 2020
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Thu 08/06 4:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
4 4 motion Motion to Consolidate Wed 07/22 2:58 PM
Motion to Consolidate Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 07/08 5:18 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants MDC Energy LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, July 02, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 07/02 5:30 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50660 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9857881, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 07/02 3:57 PM
Adversary case 20-50660 Complaint Complaint and Request for Declaratory Judgment to Determine Validity, Priority, and Extent of Statutory Mineral Liens on the Debtors' Property by Globe Chemical, LLC against MDC Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH IN ITS CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE AGENT AND LENDER. Fee Amount $350 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)). AP Summons Served due date: 10/1/2020. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A