Pumpco Energy Services, Inc. v. MDC Energy LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:20-ap-50669 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2020 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
MDC Energy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MDC Texas Operator, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MDC Reeves Energy LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH IN ITS CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE AGENT AND LENDER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pumpco Energy Services, Inc.
17171 Park Row Suite 160
HOUSTON, TX 77084 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago |
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 06/27 2:49 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50669 Closed (DMC) |
||
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA) |
|
Friday, August 07, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding directing the procedural consolidation of this adversary proceeding pending under Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS). The docket in Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters concerning this adversary proceeding. Order Signed on 8/7/2020 (Murin, Leslie) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORDER (I) PROCEDURALLY CONSOLIDATINGADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS, AND (II) SETTINGCERTAIN DEADLINES WITH RESPECT THERETO Order Signed on 8/7/2020. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Consolidate Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants MDC Energy LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator, LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 9/8/2020. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 02, 2020 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 07/02 5:30 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50669 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9857881, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 20-50669 Complaint Complaint and Request for Declaratory Judgment to Determine Validity, Priority, and Extent of Statutory Mineral Liens on the Debtors' Property by Pumpco Energy Services, Inc. against MDC Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH IN ITS CAPACITY AS ADMINISTRATIVE AGENT AND LENDER. Fee Amount $350 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)). AP Summons Served due date: 10/1/2020. (Griffiths, Norman) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |