Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-12269

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:20-ap-50681
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2020
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
MDC ENERGY LLC
Represented By
MDC ENERGY LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC
Represented By
MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC
contact info
Defendant
MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC
Represented By
MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC
contact info
Defendant
NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH, AS AGENT
Represented By
NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH, AS AGENT
contact info
Plaintiff
Tri-State Oilfield Services, LLC
Represented By
Stacy L. Newman
Ashby & Geddes, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/27 3:09 PM
Adversary Case 1:20-ap-50681 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
10 10 notice Withdrawal - Notice Mon 05/24 2:06 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Ashby & Geddes, P.A. for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel to Tri-State Oilfield Services, LLC Related [+] Filed by Ashby & Geddes, P.A. (Newman, Stacy)
Related: [-] 9
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, May 03, 2021
9 9 motion Withdraw As Attorney - Motion Mon 05/03 1:14 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney // Motion of Ashby & Geddes, P.A. for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel to Tri-State Oilfield Services, LLC Filed by Ashby & Geddes, P.A.. Hearing scheduled for 5/26/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/17/2021. (Taylor, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A: Proposed Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, April 26, 2021
8 8 court Case Reassigned Mon 04/26 4:42 PM
Order Reassigning Case. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
7 7 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 09/29 3:30 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants MDC Energy LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, Natixis, New York Branch. Related [+] Tickle due by: 11/30/2020. (Newman, Stacy)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 07, 2020
6 6 24 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 2:21 PM
An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding directing the procedural consolidation of this adversary proceeding pending under Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS). The docket in Adv. No. 20-50553 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters concerning this adversary proceeding. Order Signed on 8/7/2020 (Murin, Leslie)
Related: [-]
5 5 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/07 12:13 PM
ORDER (I) PROCEDURALLY CONSOLIDATINGADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS, AND (II) SETTINGCERTAIN DEADLINES WITH RESPECT THERETO Related [+] Order Signed on 8/7/2020. (CAS)
Related: [-] 3
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, August 06, 2020
4 4 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Thu 08/06 4:05 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2020
3 3 motion Motion to Consolidate Wed 07/22 2:58 PM
Motion to Consolidate Joint Motion of Defendants for Entry of an Order (I) Procedurally Consolidating Adversary Proceedings, and (II) Setting Certain Deadlines with Respect Thereto Filed by MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy LLC, MDC Energy, LLC, MDC Reeves Energy LLC, MDC Texas Energy, LLC, MDC Texas Operator LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Holdings LLC, MTE Partners LLC. (Turlington, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2020
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 07/02 9:30 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 20-50681 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 9858050, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 07/02 9:27 PM
Adversary case 20-50681 Complaint and Request for Declaratory Judgment to Determine Validity, Priority and Extent of Mineral Liens on the Debtors' Property by Tri-State Oilfield Services, LLC against MDC ENERGY LLC, MDC TEXAS OPERATOR LLC, MDC REEVES ENERGY LLC, NATIXIS, NEW YORK BRANCH, AS AGENT. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)). AP Summons Served due date: 10/2/2020. (Newman, Stacy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B